House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Representative Moore Omokunde added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Representative Billings added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Representative Haywood added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Representative Goyke added as a coauthor | ||
House | 12/22/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety | ||
House | 12/22/2023 | Introduced |