House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Representative Penterman added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 6, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Representative Donovan added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Representative Knodl added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Introduced |