House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Representative Neubauer added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/02/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/02/2024 | Introduced |