House
|
03/01/2024
|
Published 3-1-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 2-29-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 98
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 2-26-2024 by directive of the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 2-16-2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from joint committee on Finance and take up
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Referred to joint committee on Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:28 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 14, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Representative Shankland added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
Representative Rettinger added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/02/2024
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
01/02/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|