House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 7, Noes 1 | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Maxey | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Senator Cowles added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Maxey | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Introduced |