Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Universities and Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 96, Noes 2
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 14, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
09/07/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
09/07/2023
|
Representative Joers added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Representatives J. Anderson, O'Connor, Goeben and Michalski added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|