House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 14, Noes 1 | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 14, Noes 1 | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Representatives Dittrich and Shelton added as coauthors | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Plumer | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Representative Joers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | Introduced |