House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:38 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Zimmerman | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Introduced |