1 | 1 | | LRB-4106/1 |
---|
2 | 2 | | KP:skw |
---|
3 | 3 | | 2023 - 2024 LEGISLATURE |
---|
4 | 4 | | 2023 ASSEMBLY BILL 922 |
---|
5 | 5 | | January 12, 2024 - Introduced by Representatives SORTWELL, MURPHY, O'CONNOR, |
---|
6 | 6 | | SCHMIDT and GOEBEN, cosponsored by Senator JACQUE. Referred to Committee |
---|
7 | 7 | | on Ways and Means. |
---|
8 | 8 | | ***AUTHORS SUBJECT TO CHANGE*** |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT to renumber and amend 71.98 (3); and to create 71.98 (3) (b) and 71.98 |
---|
10 | 10 | | (3) (c) of the statutes; relating to: adopting federal income tax provisions |
---|
11 | 11 | | related to depreciation and amortization. |
---|
12 | 12 | | Analysis by the Legislative Reference Bureau |
---|
13 | 13 | | This bill adopts, beginning in tax year 2023, for state income and franchise tax |
---|
14 | 14 | | purposes, the current federal Internal Revenue Code related to depreciation and |
---|
15 | 15 | | amortization, including provisions related to a depreciation allowance for certain |
---|
16 | 16 | | property, known as bonus depreciation. For state income and franchise tax purposes, |
---|
17 | 17 | | current law generally adopts the federal Internal Revenue Code provisions related |
---|
18 | 18 | | to depreciation and amortization in effect on January 1, 2014. Under the bill, |
---|
19 | 19 | | generally, a taxpayer may take a depreciation deduction equal to 80 percent of the |
---|
20 | 20 | | adjusted basis of qualified property placed in service during tax year 2023, and the |
---|
21 | 21 | | applicable deduction percentage is 60 percent for tax year 2024, 40 percent for tax |
---|
22 | 22 | | year 2025, and 20 percent for tax year 2026. Under current federal law, the bonus |
---|
23 | 23 | | depreciation allowance sunsets for tax year 2027. |
---|
24 | 24 | | For further information see the state fiscal estimate, which will be printed as |
---|
25 | 25 | | an appendix to this bill. |
---|
26 | 26 | | The people of the state of Wisconsin, represented in senate and assembly, do |
---|
27 | 27 | | enact as follows: |
---|
28 | 28 | | 1 |
---|
29 | 29 | | 2 |
---|
30 | 30 | | 3 - 2 -2023 - 2024 Legislature LRB-4106/1 |
---|
31 | 31 | | KP:skw |
---|
32 | 32 | | SECTION 1 ASSEMBLY BILL 922 |
---|
33 | 33 | | SECTION 1. 71.98 (3) of the statutes is renumbered 71.98 (3) (a) and amended |
---|
34 | 34 | | to read: |
---|
35 | 35 | | 71.98 (3) (a) For taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013, and before |
---|
36 | 36 | | January 1, 2023, and for purposes of computing depreciation and amortization, the |
---|
37 | 37 | | Internal Revenue Code means the federal Internal Revenue Code in effect for federal |
---|
38 | 38 | | purposes on January 1, 2014, except that sections 13201 (f), 13203, 13204, and 13205 |
---|
39 | 39 | | of P.L. 115-97, section 2307 of division A of P.L. 116-136, and section 202 of division |
---|
40 | 40 | | EE of P.L. 116-260 apply at the same time as for federal purposes. |
---|
41 | 41 | | (d) For taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013, and for purposes of |
---|
42 | 42 | | computing depletion, the Internal Revenue Code means the federal Internal |
---|
43 | 43 | | Revenue Code in effect for federal purposes for the year in which the property is |
---|
44 | 44 | | placed in service. |
---|
45 | 45 | | SECTION 2. 71.98 (3) (b) of the statutes is created to read: |
---|
46 | 46 | | 71.98 (3) (b) Notwithstanding ss. 71.01 (6) (m), 71.22 (4) (m), and 71.42 (2) (m), |
---|
47 | 47 | | for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2022, and for purposes of computing |
---|
48 | 48 | | depreciation, the Internal Revenue Code means the federal Internal Revenue Code |
---|
49 | 49 | | in effect for federal purposes for the year in which the property is placed in service, |
---|
50 | 50 | | except that property placed in service in taxable years beginning before January 1, |
---|
51 | 51 | | 2023, shall continue to be depreciated as described in par. (a). |
---|
52 | 52 | | SECTION 3. 71.98 (3) (c) of the statutes is created to read: |
---|
53 | 53 | | 71.98 (3) (c) Notwithstanding ss. 71.01 (6) (m), 71.22 (4) (m), and 71.42 (2) (m), |
---|
54 | 54 | | for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2022, and for purposes of computing |
---|
55 | 55 | | amortization, the Internal Revenue Code means the federal Internal Revenue Code |
---|
56 | 56 | | in effect for federal purposes for the year in which the amortized expense is made, |
---|
57 | 57 | | 1 |
---|
58 | 58 | | 2 |
---|
59 | 59 | | 3 |
---|
60 | 60 | | 4 |
---|
61 | 61 | | 5 |
---|
62 | 62 | | 6 |
---|
63 | 63 | | 7 |
---|
64 | 64 | | 8 |
---|
65 | 65 | | 9 |
---|
66 | 66 | | 10 |
---|
67 | 67 | | 11 |
---|
68 | 68 | | 12 |
---|
69 | 69 | | 13 |
---|
70 | 70 | | 14 |
---|
71 | 71 | | 15 |
---|
72 | 72 | | 16 |
---|
73 | 73 | | 17 |
---|
74 | 74 | | 18 |
---|
75 | 75 | | 19 |
---|
76 | 76 | | 20 |
---|
77 | 77 | | 21 |
---|
78 | 78 | | 22 |
---|
79 | 79 | | 23 |
---|
80 | 80 | | 24 - 3 -2023 - 2024 Legislature |
---|
81 | 81 | | LRB-4106/1 |
---|
82 | 82 | | KP:skw |
---|
83 | 83 | | SECTION 3 |
---|
84 | 84 | | ASSEMBLY BILL 922 |
---|
85 | 85 | | except that amortized expenses made in taxable years beginning before January 1, |
---|
86 | 86 | | 2023, shall continue to be amortized as described in par. (a). |
---|
87 | 87 | | (END) |
---|
88 | 88 | | 1 |
---|
89 | 89 | | 2 |
---|
90 | 90 | | 3 |
---|