House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Representatives Gustafson and Maxey added as coauthors | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Placed on calendar 11-9-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 3, Noes 2 | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Representative Bodden added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Introduced |