House
|
03/21/2024
|
Published 3-22-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-21-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 145
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 3-15-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from joint committee on Finance and take up
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Referred to joint committee on Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 7, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Universities and Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Representative Brooks added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 11, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 11, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wittke
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|