House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:41 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 16, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 16, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sapik | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Introduced |