House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Palmeri | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | LRB correction | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Introduced |