House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 8, Noes 4 | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Representative Jacobson withdrawn as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Introduced |