House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Representative Joers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Introduced |