Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Read a third time and passed | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Read a second time | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:42 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 16, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Introduced |