House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative McGuire | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative J. Anderson | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:43 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 10, Noes 4 | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Representative Moses added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | Introduced |