House
|
05/15/2024
|
Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2024
|
Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-29-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 3-14-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:45 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 8, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 12, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 12, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Pronschinske
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Pronschinske
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Representative Behnke withdrawn as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|