House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:46 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Mursau | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Introduced |