Wisconsin 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AB958 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Wisconsin Legislative Council 
AMENDMENT MEMO 
One Ea st Ma in Stre e t, Suite 401 • Ma dison, W I 53703 • (608) 266-1304 • le g.council@le gis.wisconsin.gov • http://www.le gis.wisconsin.gov/lc 
Memo published: February 14, 2024 	Contact: Rachel E. Letzing, Deputy Director 
2023 Assembly Bill 958 Assembly Amendment 1 
2023 ASSEMBLY BILL 958 
2023 Assembly Bill 958 makes various changes to the electronic waste recycling program administered 
by the Department of Natural Resources (DNR). Among these changes, the bill modifies manufacturer 
reporting requirements, as well as the formula used to calculate a manufacturer’s target recycling 
weight for each program year. 
Under the bill, a manufacturer’s target recycling weight is generally calculated by multiplying the 
manufacturer’s market share of certain electronic devices sold in the state by the total weight of certain 
electronic devices collected in the state by recyclers. A manufacturer’s target recycling weight for a given 
program year is calculated based upon the market share and total weight of devices collected in the 
program year that began two program years prior to the given program year. For example, a 
manufacturer’s target recycling weight for 2027 would be based upon device sales and the total amount 
of devices collected by recyclers in 2025.  
The bill also includes nonstatutory provisions that specify target recycling weights for program years 
2024 and 2025. The target weight formulae under these nonstatutory provisions generally mirror the 
bill’s modifications to the current formula. However, absent the nonstatutory provision, the bill would 
not provide manufacturers with targets for program year 2024 because the bill directs DNR to provide 
targets for each program year by August of the prior year (a date that has already passed). The 
nonstatutory provision establishing the 2025 target recycling weight formula includes a two-thirds 
multiplier, reflecting the fact that the formula relies upon the weight of devices collected during an 18-
month period (the “transition year,” which resulted from prior legislation that shifted program years 
from the state fiscal year to the calendar year). 
ASSEMBLY AMENDMENT 1 
Assembly Amendment 1 makes changes to the bill’s nonstatutory provisions relating to the target 
recycling weights for program years 2024 and 2025, as follows: 
 For the recycling targets for 2024, the amendment modifies the formula to use a manufacturer’s 
market share during calendar year 2022, rather than its market share during program year 2021-22. 
The amendment also directs DNR to calculate each manufacturer’s target and report the target to 
each manufacturer no later than April 15, 2024. 
 For the recycling targets for 2025, the amendment modifies the formula to use a manufacturer’s 
market share during calendar year 2023, rather than its market share during the transition year 
(i.e., the period from July 1, 2022 to December 31, 2023). 
The amendment also includes an additional nonstatutory provision to require a manufacturer’s 2024 
registration to separately report weights sold in calendar year 2022 and calendar year 2023. To 
accompany this change, the amendment repeals a provision under current law under which the  - 2 - 
information regarding the weights sold in calendar years 2022 and 2023 would be submitted through 
manufacturer registrations in 2024 and 2025, respectively.
1
 
Finally, the amendment modifies language within certain provisions establishing target recycling 
weights to specify that the total weight of electronic devices used in the calculation is the weight that 
was “collected and received by recyclers for recycling,” rather than the weight “collected by” recyclers. 
BILL HISTORY 
Representative Mursau offered Assembly Amendment 1 on February 6, 2024. On February 8, 2024, the 
Assembly Committee on Environment recommended adoption of the amendment and passage of the 
bill, as amended, on votes of Ayes, 9; Noes, 0. 
For a full history of the bill, visit the Legislature’s bill history page. 
REL:jal 
                                                
1
 In repealing this provision, the amendment also repeals an obsolete reporting requirement applicable only to 
manufacturer registrations submitted in 2022.