Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Government Operations
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Representative Haywood added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Representatives Cabrera and C. Anderson added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Representative Joers added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-14-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 12, Noes 3
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 13, Noes 1
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 13, Noes 1
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Plumer
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Plumer
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|