House | 05/22/2024 | Representative Doyle added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Representative Billings added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Representative Haywood added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Tourism | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Introduced |