Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 90, Noes 7 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Read a second time | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:50 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and referred to committee on Rules pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Representative Penterman added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Referred to joint committee on Finance | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 2 | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Introduced |