Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Senator Wanggaard added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 53, Noes 46
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 3 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Point of order that Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wichgers
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Point of order that Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Wichgers
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Decision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 91, Noes 8
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Point of order that Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Representative Wichgers
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Decision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 92, Noes 7
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Point of order that Assembly Substitute Amendment 4 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 4 offered by Representative Wichgers
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Decision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 90, Noes 9
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Decision of the Chair appealed
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Point of order that Assembly Substitute Amendment 5 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 5 offered by Representative Wichgers
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 3)
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:30 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 9, Noes 7
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 3 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 9, Noes 7
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Rozar
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Rozar
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Rozar
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Representative Melotik withdrawn as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|