House
|
03/28/2024
|
Published 3-28-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-27-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 239
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-21-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 3-15-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative O'Connor
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 10, Noes 5
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative O'Connor
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Senator Jacque added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|