Wisconsin 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AB978 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Wisconsin Legislative Council 
AMENDMENT MEMO 
One Ea st Ma in Stre e t, Suite 401 • Ma dison, W I 53703 • (608) 266-1304 • le g.council@le gis.wisconsin.gov • http://www.le gis.wisconsin.gov/lc 
Memo published: February 22, 2024 	Contact: Tom Koss, Staff Attorney 
2023 Assembly Bill 978 
Assembly Substitute 
Amendment 2 
2023 ASSEMBLY BILL 978 
Very generally, 2023 Assembly Bill 978 creates a statewide human trafficking council, requires counties 
with an above-average level of sex trafficking activity to establish a county task force to combat sex 
trafficking in that county, and requires certain law enforcement officers to undergo training related to 
human trafficking. 
The bill attaches the council to the Department of Justice (DOJ) and specifies 14 appointees that 
comprise the council’s membership, including certain cabinet secretaries and law enforcement 
representatives. The council must submit a report to the Legislature each year that summarizes the data 
collected by and activities of the council during the previous year. 
The bill assigns the council several duties. As relevant to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2, those 
duties include: (1) annually reviewing and assessing the efficacy of state expenditures related to human 
trafficking; (2) compiling data on human trafficking offenses in Wisconsin; and (3) using that data to 
assess sex trafficking activities in each county; and (4) determining whether a county is experiencing 
above-average sex trafficking activities.  
The bill requires counties experiencing above-average sex trafficking activities to establish a sex 
trafficking task force that is directed to combat sex trafficking, including identifying and investigating 
sex trafficking, supporting victims, and raising community awareness. Each county task force must 
include representatives from law enforcement agencies, county departments, and local nonprofit 
groups.  
The bill also requires each political subdivision with a population of 10,000 or more to designate a lead 
human trafficking officer. That officer must annually complete a human trafficking training course 
developed by the Law Enforcement Standards Board (LESB), in consultation with the council. 
ASSEMBLY SUBSTITUTE AMENDMENT 2 
Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 generally modifies the council’s duties and membership, removes 
the requirements related to law enforcement officers and county sex trafficking task forces, and delays 
the bill’s effective date. 
The amendment removes the requirements that counties experiencing above-average sex trafficking 
activities establish a sex trafficking task force and that each person in charge of the law enforcement 
agency for any political subdivision with a population of 10,000 or more designate a lead human 
trafficking officer. Instead, the council is required to make recommendations regarding whether a 
county should establish a sex trafficking task force and whether a law enforcement agency in that 
county should designate a law enforcement officer to coordinate human trafficking efforts, and counties  - 2 - 
and law enforcement agencies that receive those recommendations are encouraged to follow the 
recommendations. 
The amendment modifies the requirement that the council annually review and assess the efficacy of 
state spending related to human trafficking. Rather than do so annually, the council must do so once 
every three years, beginning on July 1, 2028. The amendment also requires the council’s report to the 
Legislature to include information on any obstacles that prevented the council from successfully 
carrying out its duties during the previous year. 
Under the amendment, the council may request from, and DOJ and the Department of Administration 
(DOA) must collaborate to provide, any data necessary to carry out the council’s duties.  
The amendment adds the following to the council’s membership:  
 The secretary of DOA, or his or her designee. 
 The secretary of the Department of Health Services, or his or her designee. 
 The secretary of the Department of Safety and Professional Services, or his or her designee. 
 The secretary of the Department of Workforce Development, or his or her designee. 
 Two senators and two representatives to the Assembly from the two major political parties, 
appointed as are members of standing committees. 
 One Native American member, appointed by the Great Lakes Inter-Tribal Council, Inc. 
 The director of DOJ’s Division of Criminal Investigation human trafficking and Internet crimes 
against children bureau, or his or her designee, rather than one representative of the Internet 
Crimes Against Children task forces. 
The amendment also requires LESB to develop a list of recommending training courses related to 
human trafficking for law enforcement officers, rather than establish such a course. 
Finally, the amendment includes a delayed effective date, so that the provisions other than the 
requirement that LESB develop a list of training courses take effect on of July 1, 2025. 
BILL HISTORY 
Representative O’Connor offered Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 on February 20, 2024. On 
February 21, 2024, the Assembly adopted the amendment and passed the bill, as amended, on voice 
votes. 
For a full history of the bill, visit the Legislature’s bill history page.  
TK:ksm