House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Family Law | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Introduced |