House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Placed on calendar 1-19-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Report adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 6, Noes 1 | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | Representatives Brooks and Donovan added as coauthors | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/06/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 01/06/2023 | Introduced |