House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Representative Armstrong added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Representative Schutt added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Representative Schmidt added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/02/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections | ||
House | 01/02/2024 | Introduced |