House | 02/16/2024 | Report correctly enrolled on 2-16-2024 | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Received from Senate concurred in | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Concurred in | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Adopted | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:31 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Introduced |