House
|
04/29/2024
|
Published 4-29-2024. Enrolled Joint Resolution 15
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 3-19-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 3-19-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 22, Noes 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Government Operations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Read a third time and adopted, Ayes 62, Noes 35
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Report adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 5, Noes 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Representative Rettinger added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|