House
|
04/29/2024
|
Published 4-29-2024. Enrolled Joint Resolution 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 3-19-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 3-19-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 22, Noes 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Government Operations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and adopted, Ayes 64, Noes 34
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Report adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 8, Noes 5
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Representative Katsma added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|