House | 03/24/2023 | Report correctly enrolled on 3-24-2023 | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Representative Haywood added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Received from Senate concurred in | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Concurred in | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Adopted | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Representative Clancy added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Placed on calendar 3-14-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Introduced |