House | 05/11/2023 | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 4 | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 4-21-2023 | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Report correctly enrolled on 4-20-2023 | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Received from Senate concurred in | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Concurred in by unanimous rising vote | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Read | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Placed on calendar 4-19-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Representative Haywood added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Adopted | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Placed on calendar 4-18-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Introduced |