House | 06/12/2023 | Report correctly enrolled on 6-12-2023 | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Received from Senate concurred in | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Concurred in | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Adopted | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Senator Larson added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Placed on calendar 4-25-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Representative Haywood added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Introduced |