Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Adopted | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Placed on calendar 4-25-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Introduced |