House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Representatives Clancy, Madison and Haywood added as coauthors | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Representative Vining added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Placed on calendar 4-25-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Introduced |