House | 06/09/2023 | Report correctly enrolled on 6-9-2023 | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Received from Senate concurred in | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Concurred in | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Adopted | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Representatives Clancy and Madison added as coauthors | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Representative Palmeri added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Placed on calendar 4-25-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Introduced |