Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 09/20/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 09/20/2023 | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 09/15/2023 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Adopted | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | Placed on calendar 9-14-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 07/14/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Introduced |