House | 06/29/2023 | Report correctly enrolled on 6-29-2023 | ||
House | 06/29/2023 | Received from Senate concurred in | ||
Senate | 06/28/2023 | Concurred in | ||
Senate | 06/28/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 06/27/2023 | Placed on calendar 6-28-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 06/23/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 06/23/2023 | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | Adopted | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | Representative Macco added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Placed on calendar 6-21-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Introduced |