House | 09/15/2023 | Report correctly enrolled on 9-15-2023 | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Received from Senate concurred in | ||
Senate | 09/14/2023 | Concurred in | ||
Senate | 09/14/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 09/12/2023 | Placed on calendar 9-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 06/23/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 06/23/2023 | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | Adopted | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Placed on calendar 6-21-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Introduced |