House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:02 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Report adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 5, Noes 1 | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 06/22/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 06/22/2023 | Introduced |