Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Senator Jacque added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 09/20/2023 | Read first time and referred to committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism | ||
Senate | 09/13/2023 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | Read a third time and adopted, Ayes 63, Noes 35 | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | Read a second time | ||
House | 09/07/2023 | Placed on calendar 9-12-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 09/06/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 09/06/2023 | Report adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 8, Noes 4 | ||
House | 09/06/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 08/30/2023 | Representative Brooks added as a coauthor | ||
House | 08/30/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 08/29/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means | ||
House | 08/29/2023 | Introduced |