House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 10/23/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/11/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Representative Bare added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | Placed on calendar 9-14-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/11/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 09/11/2023 | Introduced |