House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Placed on calendar 11-9-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | Report adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 4, Noes 3 | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 10/30/2023 | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 09/29/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections | ||
House | 09/29/2023 | Introduced |