House
|
10/23/2023
|
Representative Haywood added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled on 10-18-2023
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Representative Andraca added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Senator Cowles added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Representative Schraa added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Representative Subeck added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Senator L. Johnson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Representative Shankland added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Representative Swearingen added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/09/2023
|
Read and referred to Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/09/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|