House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 11/22/2023 | Representative Haywood added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Senator Agard added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/10/2023 | Senator Spreitzer added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Introduced |