House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Report adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 12/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs | ||
House | 12/08/2023 | Introduced |