LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Wisconsin WI
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
AR11
Action History
WI
Wisconsin Assembly Bill AR11
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session
Wisconsin Assembly Bill AR11
Action History
House
06/16/2023
Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 6-16-2023
House
06/12/2023
Report correctly engrossed on 6-12-2023
House
06/07/2023
Adopted
House
06/01/2023
Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 by Committee on Rules
House
05/12/2023
Read and referred to Committee on Rules
House
05/12/2023
Introduced