House | 09/19/2023 | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 9-19-2023 | ||
House | 09/13/2023 | Report correctly engrossed on 9-13-2023 | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | Adopted | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up | ||
House | 09/07/2023 | Placed on calendar 9-12-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Introduced |